WOODLAND WAYS BUSHCRAFT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities began with helping to secure land for a remote Maasai community in Kenya in order to build a school. This led to further projects including the build of the school and ongoing funding of education there. The growing relationship with the communities in Kenya has led to a number of projects being identified with which the charity helps, such as the school feeding and water programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kenya
Governance
- 29 September 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JASON INGAMELLS | Chair | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Julian Edward Jenner | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Higgins | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.16k | £2.40k | £2.75k | £5.74k | £2.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.89k | £2.86k | £1.03k | £7.23k | £2.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 17 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 APR 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/09/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THESE OBJECTS WILL BE FURTHERED IN KENYA AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Church Brow
Chapel-en-le-Frith
HIGH PEAK
SK23 0EU
- Phone:
- 07932073234
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
bushcraftfoundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window