PINPOINT CAMBRIDGESHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs of children and young people in Cambridgeshire aged 0-25 with additional needs, their parents, carers and families by providing support and services in particular but not exclusively by a) providing a range of forums, training opportunities and advocacy services and b) providing information, advice and signposting to specialist services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £95,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 06 May 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Dullaghan | Chair | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Berry | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Guscott | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tina McEwan-Kruger | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hasan Amjad | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Hall | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £214.08k | £179.64k | £150.82k | £159.81k | £150.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.58k | £127.15k | £147.94k | £142.79k | £157.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £50.61k | £50.90k | £46.50k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £205.70k | £117.13k | £96.50k | £95.50k | £95.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 06 May 2014 as amended on 04 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN CAMBRIDGESHIRE AGED 0-25 WITH ADDITIONAL NEEDS, THEIR PARENTS, CARERS AND FAMILIES BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND SERVICES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING A RANGE OF FORUMS, TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES AND ADVOCACY SERVICES AND B) PROVIDING INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SIGNPOSTING TO SPECIALIST SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. IVES TOWN HALL
MARKET HILL
ST. IVES
PE27 5AL
- Phone:
- 01480877333
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window