MY LIFE FILMS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
My Life Film's charitable objective is to improve the lives of people living with dementia, and support their families, friends and carers through the use of creative filmmaking, storytelling and content. My Life Films provides film and video based services for people living with dementia and their carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 May 2014: Standard registration
- 15 May 2025: Funds received from 286256 THE MARGARET FISHER CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Kann | Chair | 03 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julian Garner Freeston | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Lestini | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Woon | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Hewat | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shona Clegg | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maana Ruia | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
CAROLIN ROTH | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £194.01k | £269.20k | £258.76k | £255.97k | £255.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £239.85k | £174.04k | £264.17k | £246.77k | £276.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 17 January 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 17 January 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 FEB 2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES, FRIENDS AND CARERS SUFFERING FROM DEMENTIA AND ITS EFFECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 2
Dickson House
3 Grove Road
Richmond
- Phone:
- 02081546220
- Email:
- info@mylifefilms.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window