Accounts and annual returns TYP FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1158962
Charity reporting is up to date (193 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2024 13 May 2025 193 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2024 13 May 2025 193 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2023 13 May 2025 559 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2023 13 May 2025 559 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2022 05 November 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 20 November 2022 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2021 20 November 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 28 November 2021 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2020 25 December 2020 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 25 December 2020 54 days late Download Open in new window