TYP FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We've run projects that help various communities in the local areas of our teams in various countries, including a project to improve the lives of Homeless People and we have constructed a sports/community centre and a school in Ahmedabad, India. Our aim as a charity is to inspire young people to make a change in the world, for more information visit our website.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2022
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
- City Of York
- Nottinghamshire
- Warwickshire
- Throughout London
- Canada
- France
- India
- Kenya
- Kuwait
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- The Gambia
- Uganda
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
Governance
- 24 October 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EASHAN THAKRAR | Chair | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Aadil Khan | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Valavan Ananthakumaraswamy | Trustee | 19 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dylan Gokani | Trustee | 25 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Karan Patel | Trustee | 30 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sonal Thakrar | Trustee | 05 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2018 | 01/01/2019 | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.49k | £1.59k | £4.04k | £1.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.47k | £951 | £5.13k | £85 | £460 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 05 November 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | 20 November 2022 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 20 November 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | 28 November 2021 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 25 December 2020 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | 25 December 2020 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Oct 2014
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: IN THE UK BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, BASIC HYGIENE SUPPLIES AND OTHER SUPPORT TO THE HOMELESS; AND IN SLUMS IN INDIA BY THE PROVISION OF RESOURCES AN FACILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22A, Unit 1
Freetrade House, Lowther Road
STANMORE
Middlesex
HA7 1EP
- Phone:
- 08006890723
- Email:
- hello@typuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window