LEUKAEMIA BUSTERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Leukaemia Busters funds potentially life saving research into the development of new improved and safer biologic therapies for patients with haematological malignancies (blood cancers). Leukaemia Busters, formerly a charitable trust registered in 1992 (reg No 1010957) now operates as a charitable incorporated organisation (CIO) since 21 May 2014.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Dorset
- Hampshire
Governance
- 21 May 2014: CIO registration
- 06 April 2021: Funds received from 1010957 LEUKAEMIA BUSTERS
- LB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT WALTER SUTCLIFFE BEd | Chair | 21 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER JAMES DEVON BA ACA | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Serena Sarah Devon BA | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shinderpal Singh Shahi BSc | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Charles Lane PhD | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Marie Lane MSc | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID JOHN FLAVELL PhDFRCPath | Trustee | 21 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr SOPSAMORN UDNOON FLAVELL BSC PHD | Trustee | 21 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.17k | £276.74k | £93.52k | £103.01k | £161.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.94k | £104.75k | £96.93k | £108.60k | £112.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 21 MAY 2014 AMENDED ON 08 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PATIENTS WITH LEUKAEMIA, LYMPHOMA AND OTHER BLOOD-RELATED CANCERS THROUGH THE PURSUIT OF PURE AND TRANSLATIONAL SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH AIMED AT THE DEVELOPMENT OF NEW IMPROVED THERAPIES FOR THESE MALIGNANT DISEASES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MP3
SOUTHAMPTON GENERAL HOSPITAL
TREMONA RD
SOUTHAMPTON
HAMPSHIRE
SO16 6YD
- Phone:
- 02380775590
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window