Financial history Melanoma UK

Charity Number: 1157635
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £323.62k £265.27k £443.77k £455.23k £285.94k
Total expenditure £235.57k £222.80k £388.42k £557.27k £241.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A