Accounts and annual returns RHODES SCHOLARS IN BRITAIN

Charity number: 1157010
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2019 21 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 21 January 2020 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2018 21 January 2020 350 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 21 January 2020 350 days late
Annual return 05 April 2017 02 October 2018 239 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 02 October 2018 239 days late