Financial history RHODES SCHOLARS IN BRITAIN

Charity Number: 1157010
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/12/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019
Total gross income £2.55k £2.55k £244 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A