COLESHILL COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Coleshill Community Partnership manages the Coleshill Hub, Discover Coleshill Visitor Centre and Community Allotment and Shed project in Coleshill, North Warwickshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £650 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- COLESHILL COMMUNITY HUB (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £650 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 02 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 02 December 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 29 Apr 2014
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF COLESHILL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window