SELSEY COMMUNITY FORUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In partnership with local voluntary organisations, and in cooperation with the statutory and business sectors, Selsey Community Forum seeks to identify local community needs and to initiate and fund projects to develop required services. In addition, the charity operates Selsey Care Shop which coordinates and delivers a variety of adult social care services for the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income includes £9,000 from 4 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- West Sussex
Governance
- 31 March 2014: Standard registration
- 30 May 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 30 May 2024: Funds transferred to 1203445 SELSEY COMMUNITY FORUM
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.34k | £153.48k | £154.32k | £187.80k | £293.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.21k | £133.07k | £179.01k | £186.04k | £238.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £38.35k | £11.50k | £3.30k | £9.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 April 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/02/2014 AS AMENDED ON 28/03/2014
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF SELSEY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULL IN SOCIETY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window