ABERAERON SECONDARY SCHOOL DISTRICT SWIMMING POOL AND RECREATIONAL PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity built a swimming pool in 1976 on the comprehensive school campus, since that time the charity has been responsible for the operation of the pool in the provision of swimming facilities both for teaching and recreational purposes. Special equipment is also available for use by disabled children and adults. During out of hours school time the swimming pool is always available for use by
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £142,977 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 24 November 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John David Gwynne Hughes | Chair | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Darryl Robert Evans | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Crawford John Mcleary | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Davies | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Owain Andrew Jones | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.20k | £115.54k | £150.30k | £221.67k | £230.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.24k | £89.95k | £127.97k | £228.52k | £265.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £41.55k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £43.46k | £112.78k | £1.96k | £143.05k | £142.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 189 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 189 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 NOVEMBER 1976
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATIONAL OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA DEFINED BY THE CATCHMENT AREAS OF ABERAERON SECONDARY SCHOOL IN THE SAID AREA, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AND FOR THOSE PERSONS TO PROVIDE A SWIMMING POOL OR RECREATIONAL FACILITES OR IF SO DESIRED BOTH.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREAS OF ABERAERON SECONDARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gwynne Hughes Solicitors
26 Alban Square
ABERAERON
SA46 0AL
- Phone:
- 01545570861
- Email:
- JGH@gwynnehughes.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window