Financial history HEDDINGTON PRESCHOOL

Charity Number: 1156048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £277.86k £267.11k £341.90k £425.20k £436.37k
Total expenditure £248.91k £269.75k £293.93k £409.09k £410.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £177.81k £139.67k £168.67k £176.77k £253.88k