NORTHERN HOPE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Northern Hope, Birtley, Gateshead provides gymnastic training for children and adults of all ages. We hold competitions and displays, which includes all types of gymnasts at different levels. We also travel and attend competitions at different venues throughout the country, we have gymnasts who have competed at NDP and school finals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Sunderland
Governance
- 13 June 2014: Standard registration
- 17 November 2015: Funds received from 1127711 BIDDICK SPORTS COLLEGE COMMUNITY GYMNASTICS CLUB
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH HODGSON NICHOLSON | Chair | 24 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Muriel Williams | Trustee | 18 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
LYNN HOPE | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
GRAEME THOMPSON | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £172.00k | £81.06k | £117.57k | £123.73k | £120.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.00k | £124.02k | £153.06k | £129.16k | £130.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £38.95k | £21.53k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 19 December 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 19 December 2024 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 22 February 2021 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 22 February 2021 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 JAN 2013
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE YOUNG PEOPLE OF WASHINGTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN TYNE AND WEAR, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND COACHING OF GYMNASTICS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Northern Hope Centre Ltd
78 Imex Business Centre
Birtley
Chester le Street
DH3 1QT
- Phone:
- 01913389865
- Email:
- admin@northernhope.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window