LEON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects are the promotion and preservation of the health of children and the general public for the public benefit particularly in terms of nutrition and healthy food.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 May 2014: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN VINCENT | Chair | 23 February 2014 |
|
|||
Antony Perring | Trustee | 05 April 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £287.08k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.10k | £188.52k | £105.72k | £132 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 December 2021 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 December 2021 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/04/2014
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PARTICULARLY IN TERMS OF NUTRITION AND HEALTHY FOOD. THIS WILL INCLUDE, BUT IS NOT LIMITED TO: . IMPROVING ACCESS TO AND PROVISION OF HEALTHY NUTRITIOUS FOOD . PROVIDING ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT TO SERVICE PROVIDERS AND GOVERNMENT . TEACHING COOKERY AND NUTRITIONAL SKILLS, INCLUDING FOR SPECIAL OR RESTRICTED DIETS . RAISING AWARENESS, EDUCATION AND RESEARCH ON NUTRITION AND HEALTHY EATING IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE HEALTH AND QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leon Restaurants Ltd
27 Copperfield Street
LONDON
SE1 0EN
- Phone:
- 02070897070
- Email:
- foundation@leon.co
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window