COMMUNITY WELFARE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Employment Support through education and Training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 May 2014: Standard registration
- COMMUNITY WELFARE FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAZI MD ASHAN SHARIF | Chair | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Farazy Ikram | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Kamal Hossain | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.14k | £9.86k | £114.78k | £105.21k | £54.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.64k | £9.15k | £113.72k | £102.16k | £54.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 12 October 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 12 October 2024 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 23 September 2024 | 389 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 23 September 2024 | 389 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 02 January 2023 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 02 January 2023 | 124 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 08 February 2022 | 161 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 07 February 2022 | 525 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 OCT 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/04/2014
Charitable objects
1.THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT. 2.TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING ELDERLY PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE ELDERLY PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, AND TO PREVENT THEM BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY. 3.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEWHAM, TOWER HAMLETS, REDBRIDGE AND HACKNEY BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AFTER SCHOOL HOURS TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH AND SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES
Contact information
- Address:
-
COMMUNITY WELFARE FOUNDATION
191 BALAAM STREET
LONDON
E13 8AA
- Phone:
- 02039186009
- Email:
- info@cwfoundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window