WYTHALL TOGETHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish a community centre for Wythall including the provision of a public library and to provide community transport for people who have a special need. To manage Wythall Village Hall on behalf of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £500 from 2 government contract(s) and £3,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 02 May 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Peters | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Kay | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beth Loader | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sean Anthony Taylor | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Newton | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ANNE CLEAVER | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.79k | £170 | £25.24k | £22.03k | £28.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.59k | £613 | £11.93k | £37.50k | £29.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £936 | N/A | £500 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.67k | N/A | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 May 2014 as amended on 06 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
1.1 TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE PARISH OF WYTHALL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE OF SUCH A CENTRE AND LIBRARY FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. 1.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY LIBRARY. 1.3 TO PROVIDE TRANSPORT FACILITIES IN THE PARISH OF WYTHALL FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE SPECIAL NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE THEY ARE ELDERLY, POOR OR DISABLED, PEOPLE WITH YOUNG CHILDREN OR THOSE LIVING IN ISOLATED AREAS WHERE THERE ARE NO ADEQUATE PUBLIC TRANSPORT FACILITIES.
Linked charities
- 02 May 1963 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
137 HOLLYWOOD LANE
HOLLYWOOD
BIRMINGHAM
B47 5QJ
- Phone:
- 01214308478
- Email:
- wythalltogether@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window