Financial history THE WOODSTOCK FAMILY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1156449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £128.71k £90.76k £3.13k £43.16k £73.32k
Total expenditure £173.00k £73.00k £83.12k £58.42k £68.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A