THE MICHAEL BARNARD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the trust are: the relief of poverty for persons primarily in the united kingdom who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress by reason of their social and/or economic circumstances, by reason of their suffering from natural disasters, or by reason of their being victims of crime, injustice or violence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 July 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL BARNARD | Chair | 08 July 2014 |
|
|||||
John Caulcutt | Trustee | 29 November 2016 |
|
|||||
JOHN SUMMERTON | Trustee | 08 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.83k | £9.17k | £21.49k | £51.50k | £56.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £356.22k | £160.80k | £82.62k | £113.92k | £132.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 February 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 February 2023 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 Jul 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR PERSONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, BY REASON OF THEIR SUFFERING FROM NATURAL DISASTERS, OR BY REASON OF THEIR BEING VICTIMS OF CRIME OR VIOLENCE, BY: (I) PROVIDING AND PROMOTING THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND OTHER SERVICES AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREINAFTER CALLED “THE TRUSTEES”) MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND (II) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES. (B) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF RECOGNISED LONG-TERM, ACUTE OR CHRONIC MEDICAL CONDITIONS OR DISABILITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, COUNSELLING, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE; (C) THE RELIEF OF THE MENTAL ILLNESS OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DEPRESSION AND OTHER MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT; (D) THE RELIEF OF THE SICK, POOR OR HOMELESS LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES; (E) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND POOR HEALTH AMONGST ELDERLY PEOPLE; (F) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE BY THE TRUSTEES) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED; (G) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME, BE SELF-SUFFICIENT OR OBTAIN SKILLS WHICH WILL ASSIST IN THEIR EMPLOYABILITY; (H) TO TRAIN AND EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES, INCLUDING MUSIC, ART AND SPORT, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, TUITION AND SPONSORSHIP TO YOUNG PEOPLE IN RELATION TO SUCH LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES; AND (I) OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE WHICH ARE IN THE OPINION OF THE DIRECTORS BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brown Heath Park
Gregory Lane
Durley
SOUTHAMPTON
SO32 2BS
- Phone:
- 07977403704
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window