THE FRANCHISE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1 To advance education in business by developing knowledge & business skills, in particular but not exclusively to franchising; 2 To promote education & training people in the UK who would not otherwise have access to such opportunities by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage; 3 To promote equality & diversity within franchising.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 December 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMILY PRICE | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jan Mitman | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
KARL JOHN QUINTON SANDALL | Trustee | 13 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.12k | £2.55k | £1.35k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.98k | £45 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 October 2024 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 August 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 14 August 2020 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/12/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN BUSINESS BY DEVELOPING KNOWLEDGE AND BUSINESS SKILLS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN RELATION TO FRANCHISING; 2) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE PEOPLE IN THE UK WHO WOULD NOT OTHERWISE HAVE ACCESS TO SUCH OPPORTUNITIES BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) AWARDING APPRENTICESHIPS IN FRANCHISING; (B) PROVIDING TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN FRANCHISING TO PREPARE THEM FOR ENTRY INTO BUSINESS; (C) PROVIDING INFORMATION REGARDING ENTRY ROUTES INTO FRANCHISING; AND (D) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH INTO THE BARRIERS TO FRANCHISING OPPORTUNITIES THAT AFFECT DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE IN THE UK AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; 3) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY WITHIN THE FRANCHISING SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES WITHIN THE FRANCHISING SECTOR AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; AND (B) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES AND POSITIVE ACTION PROGRAMMES WITHIN THE FRANCHISING SECTOR TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE OF DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS AND TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Centurion Court
85F PARK DRIVE
MILTON PARK
ABINGDON
OX14 4RY
- Phone:
- 01235820470
- Email:
- mailroom@thebfa.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window