Financial history AL HIKMAH LEARNING CENTRE

Charity number: 1157165
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023
Total gross income £146.68k £151.84k £198.33k £159.11k £158.33k
Total expenditure £60.47k £75.17k £159.33k £174.68k £178.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £25.69k N/A £300