TEAM VERRICO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Team Verrico is committed to improving the prospects of those stricken with hard to beat cancers particularly Triple Negative Breast Cancer. We aim to assist those with a terminal diagnosis and their families. Fund research into cancer treatments. Publicise the symptoms and treatment options of certain hard to treat cancers with a view to improving detection rates and education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £24,162 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
375 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 August 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Cranfield | Chair | 03 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip Crosbie | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Emily Christelow | Trustee | 16 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jackie McHale | Trustee | 06 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL VERRICO | Trustee | 06 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £212.62k | £125.11k | £186.44k | £95.48k | £106.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.03k | £122.34k | £129.11k | £146.46k | £125.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £24.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Aug 2014
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE SUFFERING TRIPLE NEGATIVE BREAST CANCER BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS FOR RESEARCH INTO THE DISEASE AND THE PUBLICATION OF ITS RESULTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fir Tree House
Wroot Road
Finningley
Doncaster
DN9 3DU
- Phone:
- 07967677564
- Email:
- teamverrico@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window