Financial history THE CHELTENHAM FESTIVAL OF PERFORMING ARTS

Charity number: 1157550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £7.01k £36.34k £54.99k £55.36k £63.80k
Total expenditure £4.59k £42.91k £60.80k £59.51k £62.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.00k £20.00k £20.00k £20.30k