EMDEE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECTIVE OF THE CHARITY ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM AND EDUCATION IN GENERAL ACCORDING TO THE TENETS OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Bangladesh
- Belgium
- Burma
- Guyana
- India
- Panama
- South Africa
- The Gambia
Governance
- 08 August 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NAZIR MOHAMED HAJI MUSA GANI | Chair | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHOKATALLI DAWOOD VALLI MALJEE | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|||||
AZIMA MASOOD DESAI | Trustee | 24 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL SAMAD YUSUF JABBAR | Trustee | 24 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.39k | £152.38k | £214.09k | £225.05k | £199.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.75k | £172.26k | £166.88k | £241.51k | £212.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 March 2024 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05/03/2014 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 19/07/2014
Charitable objects
(I) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE, WIDOWS, ORPHANS, REFUGEES, VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTERS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF WATER WELLS AND THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHING, AND ACCOMMODATION FOR THE SAID PERSONS; (II) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROMOTING THE TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF ISLAM, PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORSHIP AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QUR?AAN AND THE SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PBUH) AS EXPOUNDED BY THE AHLE-SUNNAH-WAL-JAMAAH; (III) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR, THE UNDERPRIVILEGED AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS SCHOOLS, LIBRARIES AND TRAINING CENTRES; (IV) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG THE POOR, UNDERPRIVILEGED AND PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, MEDICINES OR GRANTS FOR MEDICAL DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT, OR PROVISION OF HEALTH FACILITIES, SUCH AS HOSPITALS AND CLINICS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rear of 1
Stamford Hill
London
N16 5TU
- Phone:
- 07971536622
- Email:
- MOUDCTRUST@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window