Financial history THE MATT PALMER TRUST

Charity number: 1156493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £8.49k £6.53k £4.41k £8.52k £6.76k
Total expenditure £35.02k £6.64k £12.78k £17.20k £26.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A