Financial history THE UTLEY FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1157399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.67m £1.56m £622.06k £637.06k £549.05k
Total expenditure £1.19m £1.09m £1.85m £1.87m £1.86m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £552.37k £617.19k £16.87k £6.09k £5.62k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.12m £946.81k £596.32k £630.97k £543.42k
Income - Other £0 £0 £8.87k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.16m £1.01m £1.66m £1.35m £1.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £28.25k £75.55k £188.96k £523.84k £662.08k
Expenditure - Governance £64.80k £105.55k £135.66k £63.57k £52.31k
Expenditure - Grants institution £951.08k £724.35k £1.41m £876.17k £769.97k
Expenditure - Investment management £28.25k £71.64k £172.14k £152.64k £246.25k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0