THE BOBBY DORKA FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are working with a local martial arts academy, where Bobby was an active member, to roll out a program, where the charity will sponsor and fund under privileged young persons, to be able to partake in the course, so we can physically see the change we are making in peoples lives. We will be working closely with a select few local charities to identify these persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 March 2014: CIO registration
- BDFT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JASBIR SINGH DORKA | Chair | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE ROY CARTER | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL JOHN MANSFIELD | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 25 Mar 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD TO PROMOTE SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 COLWYN AVENUE
DERBY
DE23 6HH
- Phone:
- 01332740175
- Email:
- info@bobbydorka.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window