START-A-HEART 247

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To get 24 hour defibrillator access into the heart of communities, through supporting communities both financially and with their own fundraising efforts. Currently we are financially in a position to fully fund safe cabinets within the Rotherham Metropolitan Borough and to part fund those in other areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 June 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICIA MARGARET LISTER | Chair | 06 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
KATRINA JANE DAVIES | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Noreen Saunders | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roger Green | Trustee | 23 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Roy Platts | Trustee | 11 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
CARRIE ELIZABETH PLATTS | Trustee | 06 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.66k | £9.16k | £24.48k | £21.17k | £13.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.61k | £11.76k | £28.47k | £26.60k | £15.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Jun 2014
Charitable objects
PRESERVATION OF LIFE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: - THE PROVISION OF (AND THE TRAINING OF PEOPLE TO USE) CARDIO PULMONARY RESUSCITATION EQUIPMENT INCLUDING AUTOMATED EXTERNAL DEFIBRILLATORS IN ENGLAND AND WALES (AND ESPECIALLY ROTHERHAM); - RAISING AWARENESS AND PROVIDING INFORMATION RELATING TO THE LOCATION AND THE USE OF SUCH EQUIPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 SHOREHAM ROAD
ROTHERHAM
S60 3EF
- Phone:
- 01709 374423
- Email:
- info@startaheart.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window