WOODFORD VALLEY ACADEMY PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help in the provision of such educational facilities or items (not provided from statutory funds) as the committee, in consultation with the staff and governors (if appropriate) shall determine Work with staff in areas of mutual interest relating to the welfare of pupils Develop a more extended relationship between the staff, parents and others associated with Woodford Valley CE Primary Academy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2018
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 11 March 2014: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Nicholls | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2015 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.79k | £2.76k | £7.39k | £7.08k | £8.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.66k | £2.82k | £8.84k | £8.08k | £8.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 327 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 327 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 693 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 693 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1058 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1058 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1423 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1423 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1788 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1788 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 FEB 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodford Valley Primary School
Middle Woodford
Salisbury
SP4 6NR
- Phone:
- 01722782361
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window