LELEKA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
- Ukraine
Governance
- 26 August 2014: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AASHISH KAKADE MASTERS IN COMMUNICATION | Chair |
|
|
|||||
TRACY KALLEND DIP - PRE SCHOOL BEHAVIOUR MGMENT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ATILIO MALATTO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEORGE MORALES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS V PALLUQUI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IRYNA DOROSH ACCOUNTING TECHNICIAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 17 April 2025 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 17 April 2025 | 437 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 April 2025 | 802 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 821 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 April 2025 | 1167 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1186 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 26 Aug 2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH OR THEIR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN THE UK AND THE UKRAINE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED ITEMS OR EQUIPMENT WHERE APPROPRIATE B) THE SUPPORT OF CHARITIES AND CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS WHICH PROVIDE CARE AND RELIEF TO SUCH PERSONS; AND C) THE SUPPORT AND TRAINING OF THOSE RESPONSIBLE FOR CARING FOR THE ELDERLY OR ORPHANS TO HELP THEM BETTER CARE FOR SUCH PERSONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Normandy Avenue
BARNET
Hertfordshire
EN5 2JA
- Phone:
- 07845593288
- Email:
- lelekaorg@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window