IDA BASS KIDNEY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Ida Bass Kidney Foundation charity has been established to contribute to improving kidney care services in Africa. We offer medical support to patients suffering from End Stage Renal Disease in Africa. This support is purely based on Haemodialysis treatment required by patients. Also other renal support and medical treatment for complications associated with End Stage Renal Disease in Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Senegal
- The Gambia
Governance
- 28 March 2014: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAILEY FLADSRUD | Chair | 06 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jason Lee Dales | Trustee | 19 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Galvin Shuttleworth | Trustee | 04 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAMES BOOTH | Trustee | 06 March 2014 |
|
|||||
ABDUL MANSARAY | Trustee | 06 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
HANS KRISTIAN FLADSRUD | Trustee | 06 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.05k | £6.26k | £2.62k | £4.19k | £156 | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.37k | £6.72k | £3.72k | £2.02k | £2.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 MAR 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE IN GAMBIA NEEDING TREATMENT FOR DISEASES OF THE KIDNEY AND RENAL FAILURE, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT, TO ENABLE HOSPITALS AND CLINICS TO BE EQUIPPED WITH DIALYSIS MACHINES AND OTHER NECESSARY DRUGS AND MEDICAL EQUIPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 FAIRFAX MEWS
LONDON
E16 1TY
- Phone:
- 07977958230
- Email:
- sailey.fladsrud@ibkf.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window