Financial history THE POLISH COMMUNITY SCHOOL PORTSMOUTH

Charity number: 1159555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £33.23k £26.70k £3.91k £26.33k £28.35k
Total expenditure £27.51k £25.62k £8.91k £21.50k £28.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A