Financial history THE MICHAEL PROJECT UK

Charity number: 1156737
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £35.06k £41.34k £48.87k £51.09k £42.48k
Total expenditure £24.26k £15.41k £53.66k £71.52k £40.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A