BERKSHIRE COUNTY SPORTS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Berkshire County Sports Club promotes community participation in healthy recreation through the provision of facilities for a range of sports. These include football and rugby pitches, cricket, tennis and squash courts, and an all-weather hockey/football pitch. All are available for use by members of the Club, as well as other sports clubs, schools, community organisations and the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 07 April 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Denham | Chair | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Mist | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Narinder Shergill | Trustee | 18 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ethan James Greene | Trustee | 18 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Jamieson Sharp | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Frank Gordon | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.55k | £118.58k | £120.14k | £156.68k | £193.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.34k | £47.67k | £57.32k | £82.91k | £160.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £40.36k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 February 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 February 2023 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 07 Apr 2014
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF A RANGE OF SPORTS INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, FOOTBALL, HOCKEY, CRICKET, RUGBY, TENNIS AND SQUASH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Berkshire County Sports Club
Sonning Lane
Sonning
READING
RG4 6ST
- Phone:
- 0118 969 1340
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window