PATCHWORK PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Evening group work, centre-based and outdoor; children, young women and men's groups, mixed groups, Slovak and Czech groups and integration work. Detached work; Street based group work and information sharing. Duke of Edinburgh Award. Daily afternoon Drop-ins dealing with employability, debt, credit union, sexual health and 1-2-1 support. School Holiday program, daily activities and residentials.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £17,800 from 1 government contract(s) and £41,555 from 3 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 23 May 2014: Standard registration
- 14 December 2015: Funds received from 1086704 BENWELL YOUNG PEOPLE'S DEVELOPMENT GROUP
- PATCHWORK, PATCHY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Tighe | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dean Curry | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Petra Ondrova | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chelsea Dixon | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Conroy | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
DONNA PARTINGTON | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Paul Marshall - Dent | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mary Shearer | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
John Pattison Chair | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE PATTISON | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROL HUNTER | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £216.19k | £230.33k | £362.84k | £276.04k | £214.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £229.33k | £225.73k | £268.29k | £259.72k | £269.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £19.57k | £17.80k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £105.74k | £36.60k | £41.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 05 May 2023 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 05 May 2023 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/05/2014
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 5 AND 25 YEARS RESIDENT IN THE WEST END OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, INCLUDING THOSE WHO ARE INVOLVED IN THE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SYSTEM OR AT RISK OF BECOMING INVOLVED IN THE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SYSTEM, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION, THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MIGHT GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Patchwork Project
83 Adelaide Terrace
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE4 8BB
- Phone:
- 01912739700
- Email:
- pachwk@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window