Trustees BLUES PRE-SCHOOL NURSERY

Charity Number: 1156613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sandrine Brault Trustee 06 May 2025
None on record
Jordan Shelby Guy Trustee 28 March 2025
None on record
Katie Ramsay Trustee 24 March 2025
None on record
Phillip Jeffries Trustee 26 February 2025
None on record
Emma Jeffries Trustee 26 February 2025
None on record
Lynne LING Trustee 18 February 2025
None on record
Robert James Ernest Eves Trustee 13 February 2024
None on record
Sophie Eves Trustee 30 November 2023
None on record