Financial history BROOMLEY GRANGE

Charity Number: 1157688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £216.23k £86.33k £43.19k £64.47k £89.77k
Total expenditure £227.92k £106.44k £94.17k £82.17k £78.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £36.36k £15.14k £4.50k N/A