NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR OSTEOPATHIC RESEARCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The National Council for Osteopathic Research (NCOR) was established in 2003 to provide leadership and unity in osteopathic research development. NCOR aims to improve the osteopathic evidence base by fostering research, increasing research capacity and capability within the osteopathic profession, and raising the profile of osteopathic and osteopathic relevant research findings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 May 2014: CIO registration
- NCOR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW WILLIAM REDFORD | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.38k | £77.61k | £78.53k | £74.74k | £120.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.54k | £102.81k | £110.68k | £68.34k | £84.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 28 May 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) LEADING AND FACILITATING OSTEOPATHIC RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT IN THE UK, INCLUDING DEVELOPING A COMPREHENSIVE AND COHESIVE RESEARCH STRATEGY PROVIDING BOTH DIRECTION AND COORDINATION OF OSTEOPATHIC RESEARCH. (2) REPRESENTING THE OSTEOPATHIC PROFESSION ON MATTERS RELATING TO THE OSTEOPATHIC EVIDENCE BASE AND RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT. ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE PROFESSION, IN A RESEARCH CONTEXT, TO THE MEDIA, THE PUBLIC AND PATIENTS, POLICY-MAKERS, THE INTER-PROFESSIONAL RESEARCH COMMUNITY, OTHER HEALTH PROFESSIONS AND HEALTHCARE REGULATORS. (3) PROVIDING A FORUM FOR OSTEOPATHIC EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS (OEIS) THROUGH WHICH TO FORGE CONSISTENT STANDARDS IN RESEARCH GOVERNANCE, TO SHARE EXPERTISE, ACHIEVE ECONOMIES OF SCALE, AND FOSTER UNDERGRADUATE AND POSTGRADUATE RESEARCH COLLABORATION. TO PROMOTE RESEARCH CAPACITY AND SCHOLARSHIP. (4) PROVIDING OSTEOPATHS, THE PUBLIC AND PATIENTS, HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS, AND THE RESEARCH AND ACADEMIC COMMUNITY WITH A RECOGNISED, HIGH QUALITY AND ACCESSIBLE RESOURCE OF RESEARCH-RELATED INFORMATION CONCERNING THE DISTINCTIVE BODY OF KNOWLEDGE WITHIN OSTEOPATHIC PRACTICE. (5) IMPROVING AWARENESS OF OSTEOPATHIC RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT AMONGST OSTEOPATHS AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY. TO ESTABLISH LINKS AND BUILD NETWORKS WITHIN THE RESEARCH FRATERNITY, NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY, WITH A VIEW TO DEVELOPMENT THROUGH COLLABORATION. TO FORMULATE AND FOSTER STRATEGIES FOR ATTRACTING FUNDING FOR OSTEOPATHIC RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT. (6) PROVIDING SYSTEMS RELEVANT FOR GRANTS GOVERNANCE AND RESEARCH GOVERNANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL STAKEHOLDERS. (7) FOSTERING AND DISSEMINATING OUTPUTS FROM OSTEOPATHIC AUDIT, EVALUATION, AND RESEARCH ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Health Sciences University
Avon House
275-287 Borough High Street
LONDON
SE1 1JE
- Phone:
- 02073576655
- Email:
- info@ncor.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window