ENABLED CHILDREN INITIATIVE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ECI PROVIDES FULL SUPPORT TO A PRIVATE CARE HOME FOR DISABLED ORPHANS IN KABUL AND COMPREHENSIVE SUPPORT TO DISABLED ORPHANS IN STATE ORPHANAGES IN KABUL. ECI ALSO ADVOCATES FOR RIGHTS AND INCLUSIONS OF CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES IN AFGHANISTAN.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Afghanistan
Governance
- 25 June 2014: Standard registration
- 18 January 2021: Funds received from 1137580 A CONFLICT OF INTEREST (KAREN WOO FOUNDATION)
- 22 May 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ECI (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.38k | £11.45k | £10.09k | £33.14k | £45.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.07k | £9.73k | £12.14k | £25.12k | £16.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 01 June 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/06/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DISABLED CHILDREN IN AFGHANISTAN, PARTICULARLY THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED, AT RISK OR WHO ARE ORPHANED OR ABANDONED IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window