MEC FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUR CHARITY'S MAIN ACTIVITY IS THE OPERATION OF TURKISH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION AND KOTKU MOSQUE IN NEWCASTLE. ACTIVITIES RUN IN THE CENTRE PROMOTES EDUCATION AND PROVIDES LEISURE FACILITIES. ADDITIONAL EVENTS ARE HELD TO ENCOURAGE AND SUPPORT THE MUSLIM FAITH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £112,914 from 150648 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 March 2014: Standard registration
- 04 November 2015: Funds received from 1077706 TURKISH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
- TURKISH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Fatih Tuysuz | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ahmet Samur | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mehmet Emin Aydin | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hayri Tut | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr MEHMET KARAKUS | Trustee | 06 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.93k | £18.10k | £38.08k | £199.15k | £150.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.76k | £20.31k | £27.32k | £138.77k | £112.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £112.91k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 01 January 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 01 January 2025 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 15 January 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 30 December 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 30 December 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 FEB 2014 as amended on 25 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO: 1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TURK ORIGIN WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; 2) ADVANCE THE MUSLIM RELIGION WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; 3) CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER OBJECTS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND ELSEWHERE AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TURKISH COMMUNITY CENTRE
35 GRAINGER PARK ROAD
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE4 8SA
- Phone:
- 01912739000
- Email:
- info@turkishcommunity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window