Accounts and annual returns GLOBAL GATHERING CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1157353
Charity reporting is up to date (26 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 March 2024 05 February 2025 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 March 2024 05 February 2025 26 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 10 March 2023 13 February 2024 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 March 2023 13 February 2024 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 10 March 2022 19 January 2023 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 March 2022 19 January 2023 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 10 March 2021 04 February 2022 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 March 2021 04 February 2022 25 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 10 March 2020 05 February 2021 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 March 2020 05 February 2021 26 days late Download Open in new window