Governing document CHOICE SUPPORT
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 NOV 2017 as amended on 28 Nov 2018 as amended on 29 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE ?OBJECTS?) ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 1.1.1 TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH (INCLUDING THOSE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ALCOHOL, DRUG AND OTHER SUBSTANCE MISUSE) DISABILITY, FINANCIAL OR OTHER HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF WELFARE AND SUPPORT (FINANCIAL OR OTHERWISE), HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE, EMPLOYMENT, HOUSING AND ENTERPRISE SUPPORT; 1.1.2 TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.