PEMBROKE & PEMBROKE DOCK AMATEUR BOXING CLUB & COMMUNITY ACTIVITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Sports
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 01 August 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER MCEWEN | Chair | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Richard Probert | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jim Dwyer | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Bates | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Davies | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
RALPH GAMMER | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
NATHAN PROBERT | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.81k | £34.28k | £25.77k | £32.71k | £38.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.15k | £26.99k | £32.06k | £25.03k | £26.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £32.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 01 Aug 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE THE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF PEMBROKE & PEMBROKE DOCK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, DISABILITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR AMATEUR BOXING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Bishops Lane
Pembroke
SA71 5JN
- Phone:
- 07891105372
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window