SKERNE PARK YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MANAGEMENT OF THE SKERNE PARK YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE, COLERIDGE GARDENS, DARLINGTON. PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL, SPORTS AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Darlington
Governance
- 25 February 1977: Standard registration
- SKERNE PARK AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH MARY MCCOLLOM | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ALEXANDER OXLEY HARMAN | Trustee | 17 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANN FALLS | Trustee | 08 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
ISOBEL JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.54k | £15.41k | £49.15k | £11.48k | £7.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.11k | £8.07k | £28.06k | £15.08k | £19.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £44.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 DECEMBER 1973 AS AMENDED 10 JANUARY 1977, 19 APRIL 1984 AND 13 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SKERNE PARK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THE INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR THE SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MANAGE THE SAME IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
SKERNE PARK AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 VICTORIA EMBANKMENT
DARLINGTON
DL1 5JR
- Phone:
- 01325483259
- Email:
- paul.harman63@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window