SPROWSTON YOUTH ENGAGEMENT PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To act as a resource for young people up to the age of 25 years living in Sprowston and the surrounding area by providing advice and assistance and organising programmes of physical, educational and other activities as a means of advancing in life and helping young people by developing their skills, capacities and capabilities, advancing education, providing recreational and leisure time activity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 14 May 2014: Standard registration
- SYEP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Simon Stokes | Chair | 28 March 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Martin Callam | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Sarah Vincent | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Christine Rumsby | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Judith Cecile Leggett | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Rev David Hagan-Palmer | Trustee | 22 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
KEITH HIDER | Trustee | 05 September 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.59k | £56.82k | £112.56k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.16k | £50.95k | £97.45k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | Download Open in new window | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 February 2022 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 February 2022 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JUL 2013 AS AMENDED ON 08/04/2014 as amended on 27 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 YEARS LIVING IN SPROWSTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: A)ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS AND TO BUILD THEIR SELF ESTEEM; B)ADVANCING EDUCATION; C)PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Pavilion
Recreation Ground
Church Street
Old Catton
NORWICH
- Phone:
- 01603423880
- Email:
- syep.treasurer@syep.co.uk
- Website:
-
syep.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window