ST LUKE'S WARD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, SOUTHEND-ON-SEA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association seeks to provide and co-ordinate projects and activities to benefit the local Ward. Currently, it runs a small subsidised cafe, two charity shops and puts on activities such as an Easter Egg Hunt, Quizzes a Christmas Fayre where presents are donated to children and operates coach trips for children, pensioners and residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 04 July 2014: CIO registration
- ST LUKE'S WARD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
sheila veronica sexton | Chair | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Halliday | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kerrie McAllister | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Paul Dalley | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.09k | £49.37k | £69.65k | £63.68k | £59.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.69k | £32.51k | £64.78k | £64.84k | £67.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £24.00k | N/A | £8.01k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Jul 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION. THE AREA OF BENEFIT ('AREA OF BENEFIT') SHALL BE THE CIVIL WARD OF ST LUKE'S, SOUTHCHURCH, SOUTHEND-ON-SEA, ESSEX.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Cluny Square
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
SS2 4AF
- Phone:
- 07449742989
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window