Financial history FUTURE'S VENTURE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1157274
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £20 £9 £571 £1.62k £98
Total expenditure £143.88k £116.13k £93.28k £104.58k £97.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A