8 BELOW HUSKY RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rehoming unwanted huskies and snow dog breeds throughout the United Kingdom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 April 2014: Standard registration
- 8 BELOW HUSKY RESCUE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy John Wicks | Chair | 11 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Elisha Robson | Trustee | 20 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jade Hayley Brightmore | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Atkinson | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Suzanne Atkinson | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.64k | £163.56k | £102.79k | £146.02k | £119.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.40k | £136.64k | £107.16k | £110.00k | £119.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/02/2014 AS AMENDED ON 01 JUL 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS AND IN PARTICULAR SLED DOG BREEDS,BY PROVIDING EDUCATION TO OWNERS AND POTENTIAL OWNERS,TO PREVENT NEGLECT AND SUFFERING TO ANIMALS.ALSO BY PROVIDING SECURITY,PROTECTION AND CARE APPROPRIATE FOR SUCH DOGS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS,MALTREATMENT,POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Carnelian Drive
SUTTON-IN-ASHFIELD
Nottinghamshire
NG17 1NY
- Phone:
- 07908932157
- Email:
- info@8belowhuskyrescue.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window