Accounts and annual returns PHELIX RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1156666
Charity reporting is up to date (78 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 January 2025 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 January 2025 78 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 October 2024 349 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 14 October 2024 349 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 October 2024 714 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 October 2024 714 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 May 2022 204 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 May 2022 204 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window