ST CHAD'S RETREAT CENTRES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to utilise the two Lichfield Diocesan centres, Shallowford House and Dovedale House, in order to provide places of retreat and reflection to fulfil the diocesan aims of reaching New Generations, Growing Disciples and Discovering the Heart of God as well as providing the general public the use of the centre for breaks and conferences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 27 June 2014: Standard registration
- 26 April 2016: Funds received from 1007037 THE JOHN YOUNG FOUNDATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Sue Watson | Chair | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
The Rev Canon Nicholas Smeeton | Trustee | 22 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rosanne Wilshire | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Boote | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jeanette Hartwell | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Bernard Vince | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £527.27k | £246.38k | £317.69k | £374.16k | £413.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £490.58k | £318.02k | £313.96k | £338.20k | £424.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £44.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £15.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £40.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £467.79k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.69k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £490.58k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 MAR 2014 as amended on 07 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND,IN PARTICULAR(BUT NOT LIMITED TO)BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF RETREAT CENTRES TO:(I)PROMOTE CHRISTIAN SPIRITUAL AND RELIGIOUS TEACHING AND EDUCATION GENERALLY;(II)PROVIDE HOSPITALITY IN THE CHRISTIAN TRADITION;AND(III)PROMOTE,PROTECT AND PRESERVE SPIRITUAL,EMOTIONAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Diane Holt
LICHFIELD DIOCESAN TRUST
ST. MARYS HOUSE
THE CLOSE
LICHFIELD
WS13 7LD
- Phone:
- 01543306030
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window